AB122
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2009.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes relating to the Office for Consumer Health Assistance. (BDR 18-35)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 10   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 34,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.55   

Bill History

Jan 27, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 28, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 55.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.
  • Returned to Assembly.
  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.)
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Made Special Order of Business for Friday, May 22, 2009, at 1:00 p.m.

May 22, 2009

  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)