AB123
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 27, 2009.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing certain offices of physicians and related facilities and surgical centers for ambulatory patients. (BDR 40-215)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 08, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 29   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.328   

Bill History

Jan 27, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 28, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 328.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Apr 29, 2009

Apr 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 149.
  • Sections 1, 15, 16, 17, 24 and 27 of this act effective May 22, 2009, for the purpose of adopting regulations and on January 1, 2010, for all other purposes. Sections 2 to 14, inclusive, 18 to 23, inclusive, 25 and 26 of this act effective January 1, 2010.