AB124
Introduced in the Assembly on Jan 28, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Grady

Revises provisions governing unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-667)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 281.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 06, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 09   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.88   

Bill History

Jan 28, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Jan 29, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 88.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 281.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.