SB114
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 03, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Makes various changes relating to systems for obtaining and using solar energy and other renewable energy resources. (BDR 58-380)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 22, 2009     05:09 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 06   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.6     Amend. No.844   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 04, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 6.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 21, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 844.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 844 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
  • Effective May 29, 2009.