AB6
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 02, 2008.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing certain emergency admissions to mental health facilities and hospitals. (BDR 39-211)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 03, 2009     03:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 06, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.523   

Bill History

Dec 02, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 523.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 92.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.