SB119
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions governing massage therapists. (BDR 54-162)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 26, 2009     11:20 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.221     Amend. No.777     Amend. No.936     Amend. No.CA9   

Bill History

Feb 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 936.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 26, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 777 and 936 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

May 31, 2009

  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 459.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.