SB120
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Mathews , Washington , Townsend , Horsford , Amodei , Hardy , McGinness , Nolan , Parks , Rhoads

Revises the date of the primary election. (BDR 24-370)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 10, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)