AB146
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Provides for the establishment of a state business portal. (BDR 7-972)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 381.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 18, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May. 19, 2009     12:05 PM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Finance     May. 20, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 11,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (3rd Reprint)       May. 29   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (3rd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.476     Amend. No.829     Amend. No.875   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 476.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 829.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 875.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 29, 2009

May 31, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Sunday, May 31, 2009, at 7:15 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 381.
  • Sections 45.5 and 47 of this act effective May 31, 2009. Sections 1 to 45, inclusive, 46 and 46.5 of this act effective: (a) June 1, 2009, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory actions that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) October 1, 2009, for all other purposes.