AB8
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 02, 2008.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes governing the investigations of the criminal history of certain employees and licensees and creates the Statewide Central Registry for the Collection of Information Concerning the Abuse, Neglect, Exploitation or Isolation of Older Persons. (BDR 38-98)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 11, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 09, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.396   

Bill History

Dec 02, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 396.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)