SB127
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Amodei

Exempts qualified persons or groups providing construction oversight services to a long-term recovery group from regulation as a contractor. (BDR 54-596)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.489   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 489.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.