SB128
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Carlton , Horsford , Wiener , Amodei , Breeden , Cegavske , Coffin , Copening , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Nolan , Schneider , Woodhouse , Conklin , Segerblom , Anderson , Koivisto , Pierce , Aizley , Bobzien , Buckley , Denis , Dondero Loop , Grady , Leslie , Manendo , McClain , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell

Requires certain persons to record foreclosure sales and sales of real property under a deed of trust within a certain period of time. (BDR 9-841)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 247.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.468     Amend. No.732   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 468.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 732.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 732 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 247.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.