AB10
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 02, 2008.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes concerning certain health care professionals who report certain information to licensing boards or other governmental entities or who cooperate in investigations of certain health care professionals. (BDR 40-219)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass, lost
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 3-09-09   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.56     Amend. No.526   

Bill History

Dec 02, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 56.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 526.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 21, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.