SB129
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Revises provisions governing continuing education for dentists and dental hygienists. (BDR 54-769)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 05, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.