SB130
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy , Lee , Washington , Cegavske

Revises certain provisions governing certificates of permission to perform marriages. (BDR 11-468)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 197.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.107   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 107.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 197.
  • Sections 1 to 9, inclusive, 11 to 19, inclusive, and 20 effective July 1, 2009. Section 9 expires by limitation on the date of the repeal of the federal law requiring each state to establish procedures for withholding, suspending or restricting the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses for child support arrearages and for noncompliance with certain processes relating to paternity or child support proceedings. Section 10 effective on the date of the repeal of the federal law requiring each state to establish procedures for withholding, suspending or restricting the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses for child support arrearages and for noncompliance with certain processes relating to paternity or child support proceedings.