SB132
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Townsend

Revises provisions governing the treatment of animals. (BDR 50-369)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 199.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 19, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 02, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 09, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 32,   Nay 8,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.394   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 19, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 394.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Chapter 199.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.