SB134
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Coffin

Revises provisions concerning the increased penalty imposed for certain traffic violations occurring in work zones. (BDR 43-180)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Transportation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.82   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 82.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.