AB162
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall , Buckley , Leslie , Woodbury , Conklin , Aizley , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Bobzien , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Denis , Dondero Loop , Goicoechea , Grady , Hambrick , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Mastroluca , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Stewart , Horsford , Schneider , Lee , Wiener , Townsend , Amodei , Breeden , Care , Carlton , Coffin , Copening , Nolan , Parks , Rhoads , Woodhouse

Requires certain policies of health insurance and health care plans to provide coverage for screening for and treatment of autism. (BDR 57-44)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 14, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.433     Amend. No.699     Amend. No.908   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 433.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 908.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 699 and 908 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.
  • Sections 1 to 9 and 16, inclusive, 10 and 11 to 15, inclusive, of this act effective May 29, 2009, for the purpose of adopting regulations, licensing behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts and certifying autism behavior interventionists; and January 1, 2011, for all other purposes. Sections 9.5, 10.5, 15.3 and 15.5 of this act effective May 29, 2009, for the purposes of adopting regulations; and July 1, 2011, for all other purposes.