SB136
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden , Wiener , Nolan , Schneider , Copening , Parks , Woodhouse , Denis , Hambrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Segerblom

Prohibits a person operating a motor vehicle from using a telephonic device to write, send or read a text-based communication while the motor vehicle is in motion or stopped at certain intersections. (BDR 43-776)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.146   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 146.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)