SB137
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden , Parks , Copening , Woodhouse , Segerblom , Denis , Koivisto , Manendo , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parnell

Provides for the placement of recycling containers in certain locations. (BDR 40-741)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 222.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Feb. 26, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 07, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 09, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 22, 2009     04:23 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.393     Amend. No.706     Amend. No.846   

Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 393.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 706.) To printer.

May 18, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 21, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 846.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 706 and 846 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 222.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.