SB138
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Nolan

Establishes the means by which a self-insurer of motor vehicles may provide proof of the ability to pay judgments obtained against him. (BDR 43-224)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)