SB139
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Nolan , Coffin , Amodei , Breeden , Care , Carlton , Cegavske , Copening , Hardy , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Parks , Raggio , Rhoads , Schneider , Townsend , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse

Provides for the issuance of special license plates for family members of persons killed in the line of duty while on active duty in the Armed Forces of the United States. (BDR 43-199)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 09   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 09, 2009

Mar 10, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 139.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.