AB167
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom , Koivisto , Ohrenschall , McClain , Aizley , Arberry , Atkinson , Bobzien , Claborn , Horne , Kihuen , Leslie , Mortenson , Parnell , Pierce , Smith , Spiegel , Parks , Copening

Requires certain policies of health insurance and health care plans to provide coverage for acupuncture treatments in certain circumstances. (BDR 57-49)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)