SB143
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2009.
By: Finance

Makes an appropriation to the Interim Finance Committee for allocation to pay costs relating to the implementation of certain legislation. (BDR S-1034)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2011 Session)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 30, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun. 01, 2009     02:53 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.966     Amend. No.999   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 966.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 999.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 999 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2011 Session)