SB17
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Revises provisions governing health care records. (BDR 54-607)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 453.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 12, 2009     07:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.230     Amend. No.571     Amend. No.746     Amend. No.CA3   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 230.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 571.) To printer.

Apr 30, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 746 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 746 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 746 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

May 29, 2009

  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

May 31, 2009

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 453.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.