SB144
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Amodei

Enacts provisions governing public safety bomb squads. (BDR 42-909)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 187.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 04, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.185   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 185.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 187.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.