AB187
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 17, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , McClain , Parnell , Leslie , Bobzien , Aizley , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Claborn , Conklin , Denis , Dondero Loop , Gansert , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Mastroluca , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Smith , Spiegel , Stewart , Parks , Raggio , Wiener , Breeden , Copening , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Woodhouse

Authorizes the establishment by district courts of a program for the treatment of certain offenders who are veterans or members of the military. (BDR 14-955)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 44.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 14, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 15, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 20, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 29   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.563   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 17, 2009

Mar 19, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 563.) To printer.

Apr 29, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 563 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 44.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.