SB146
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2009.
By: Finance

Provides funding to the Department of Wildlife for certain projects. (BDR S-652)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 16, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 19, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.610   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 03, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

May 11, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 12, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 28, 2009

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 406.
  • Effective June 1, 2009.