AB190
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Leslie , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Buckley , Atkinson , Claborn , Hogan , Horne , McClain , Munford , Pierce

Provides for a study of issues regarding the death penalty. (BDR S-764)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 24, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 07, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.315   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 315.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)