AB193
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick , Bobzien , Hardy , Conklin , Aizley , Denis , Koivisto , Pierce , Settelmeyer , Coffin , Care

Provides for reporting by certain governmental entities concerning certain financial information. (BDR S-243)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 238.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 26, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 05, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 28, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.119     Amend. No.680   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 119.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 680.) To printer.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 20, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 680 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 238.
  • Effective May 26, 2009.