SB149
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads

Exempts limited-purpose associations that are created for a rural agricultural residential common-interest community from certain fees. (BDR 10-771)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 24, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)