SB150
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads , Amodei , McGinness

Creates the Public Education Stabilization Fund. (BDR 34-664)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)