SB151
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Provides for the payment of certain claims from the Recovery Fund of the State Contractors' Board. (BDR 54-702)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 3-23-09   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.419   

Bill History

Feb 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 419.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.