SB152
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford , Schneider , Carlton , Breeden , Wiener , Copening , Woodhouse , Buckley , Oceguera , Conklin , Kirkpatrick , Bobzien , Leslie

Enacts the Green Jobs Initiative. (BDR 58-172)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 30, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.77     Amend. No.778     Amend. No.953   

Bill History

Feb 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.

May 22, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 953.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 778 and 953 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
  • Effective June 9, 2009.