SB154
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 23, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden , Woodhouse , Wiener , Segerblom , Manendo , Anderson , Aizley

Revises provisions governing mandatory bargaining with employees of local government employers. (BDR 23-779)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 03, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 07, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 14, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.375     Amend. No.565   

Bill History

Feb 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 375 and 565.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)