SB155
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 24, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Provides for possible funding for the Commission on Economic Development for certain purposes related to military installations. (BDR 18-721)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.76   

Bill History

Feb 24, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 25, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 76.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)