SB156
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 24, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Clarifies provisions governing the persons who may sign initiative petitions to recall public officers. (BDR 24-382)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 10, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 28, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 02   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 24, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 25, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

May 04, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 61.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.