SB157
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 24, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Establishes provisions governing payment for the provision of certain services and care and reports relating to those services and care. (BDR 40-808)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 30, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 03, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 07, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.446   

Bill History

Feb 24, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Feb 25, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 446.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)