SB158
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 25, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Revises provisions concerning tax increment areas created to benefit the Nevada State College. (BDR 22-905)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 25, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 26, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 23, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)