SB159
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 25, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Raggio , Nolan , Lee , Copening , Amodei , Breeden , Care , Carlton , Hardy , Mathews , McGinness , Parks , Rhoads , Schneider , Townsend , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse , Anderson , Stewart , Gansert , Cobb , Settelmeyer , Christensen , Goedhart , Mastroluca

Requires the establishment of the Cancer Drug Donation Program. (BDR 40-14)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 16, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 24, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.95   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Feb 26, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 95.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)