SB160
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 25, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to public officers and employees. (BDR 3-1164)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 257.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 12, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 21, 2009     10:24 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 04   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.675   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 26, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 04, 2009

Mar 05, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 675.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 675 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 257.
  • Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 7.4, 9 and 27 effective January 1, 2009. Sections 3.4, 3.6, 4.4, 4.6, 5.4, 5.6, 5.8, 7.2, 8 to 8.7, inclusive, and 9.5 to 26, inclusive, effective May 28, 2009.