SB162
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 02, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse , Coffin , Wiener , Horsford , Breeden , Copening , Parks , Schneider

Revises the date of the primary election and provisions governing voter registration by mail. (BDR 24-1001)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 10, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 28, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 12, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 20, 2009     09:35 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 23,   Nay 18,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.160     Amend. No.244     Amend. No.825   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 03, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 160.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 825.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 825 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.