SB164
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 02, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools and university schools for profoundly gifted pupils. (BDR 34-298)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 18, 2009     11:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     Apr. 27, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Apr. 29, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.135     Amend. No.586   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 03, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 135.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 586.) To printer.

May 04, 2009

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 15, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 586 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)