SB167
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Makes various changes to provisions governing unclaimed property. (BDR 10-396)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 11, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)