SB169
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Enacts the Revised Uniform Unincorporated Nonprofit Association Act of 2008. (BDR 7-674)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 10, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 16   Yea 36,   Nay 4,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 189.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.