SB170
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Amodei

Revises provisions governing payment for work performed for the operation and maintenance of ditches. (BDR 48-1059)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 190.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 12, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 26, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 01, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 04, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 18, 2009     04:05 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.128     Amend. No.657   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 128.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 657.) To printer.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 657 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 190.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.