SB172
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 04, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing the sale of subdivided land. (BDR 10-867)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 259.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 24, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 25, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 259.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.