SB21
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing the sale or offer for sale of certain food, drugs, and other commodities after the date of expiration for those products has passed. (BDR 51-260)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 13, 2009     12:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 31, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        

Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No.167   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)