AB239
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 04, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall , Horne , Munford , Segerblom

Revises provisions relating to habitual criminals. (BDR 15-9)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 156.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 13, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.61   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 61.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 156.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.