SB174
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Exempts certain retired public employees who are serving as volunteer firefighters from certain consequences of reemployment with a public employer. (BDR 23-768)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 191.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 13, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 191.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.