SB176
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Makes various changes relating to time shares. (BDR 10-692)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 354.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 17, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 23, 2009     11:15 AM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.106     Amend. No.779   

Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 106.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 779.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 23, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 779 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 354.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.